Followers 0

# Number Trick

## 7 posts in this topic

Posted · Report post

Using only 1-9 once, multiply a 2 digit number by a 3 digit number, that equals a 4 digit number. <!-- s:evil: --><!-- s:evil: --> <!-- s:twisted: --><!-- s:twisted: -->

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

um... am I understanding this wrong?

if not then I choose

196*42=8232

what happens now?

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

am i missing something?

45 X 123 = 5535

46 X 123 = 5658

47 X 123 = 5781

48 X 123 = 5904

49 X 123 = 6027

54 X 123 = 6642

56 X 123 = 6888

57 X 123 = 7011

58 X 123 = 7134

59 X 123 = 7257

64 X 123 = 7872

65 X 123 = 7995

67 X 123 = 8241

68 X 123 = 8364

69 X 123 = 8487

74 X 124 = 9176

75 X 125 = 9375

76 X 126 = 9576

78 X 127 = 9906

45 X 132 = 5940

46 X 132 = 6072

47 X 132 = 6204

48 X 132 = 6336

49 X 132 = 6468

54 X 132 = 7128

56 X 132 = 7392

57 X 132 = 7524

58 X 132 = 7656

59 X 132 = 7788

64 X 132 = 8448

65 X 132 = 8580

67 X 132 = 8844

68 X 132 = 8976

69 X 132 = 9108

74 X 132 = 9768

75 X 132 = 9900

there may be more - but I got tired of looking...

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

I'm pretty sure mini me means for you to use each digit from 1 to 9 exactly once in the equation.

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

You can only use each number once. but nice try

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

ahhh - suddenly it gets a bit trickier...

138 x 42 = 5796

157 x 28 = 4396

159 x 48 = 7632

186 x 39 = 7254

198 x 27 = 5346

297 x 18 = 5346

483 x 12 = 5796

0

##### Share on other sites

Posted · Report post

oooh!

now I understand it

nice puzzle

0

## Create an account

Register a new account