Jump to content


Welcome to BrainDen.com - Brain Teasers Forum

Welcome to BrainDen.com - Brain Teasers Forum. Like most online communities you must register to post in our community, but don't worry this is a simple free process. To be a part of BrainDen Forums you may create a new account or sign in if you already have an account.
As a member you could start new topics, reply to others, subscribe to topics/forums to get automatic updates, get your own profile and make new friends.

Of course, you can also enjoy our collection of amazing optical illusions and cool math games.

If you like our site, you may support us by simply clicking Google "+1" or Facebook "Like" buttons at the top.
If you have a website, we would appreciate a little link to BrainDen.

Thanks and enjoy the Den :-)
Guest Message by DevFuse
 

Photo
- - - - -

Number Trick


  • Please log in to reply
6 replies to this topic

#1 mini me

mini me

    Newbie

  • Members
  • Pip
  • 2 posts

Posted 03 January 2008 - 10:12 PM

Using only 1-9 once, multiply a 2 digit number by a 3 digit number, that equals a 4 digit number. <!-- s:evil: --><!-- s:evil: --> <!-- s:twisted: --><!-- s:twisted: -->
  • 0

#2 Ploper

Ploper

    Senior Member

  • Members
  • PipPipPipPip
  • 579 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 01:00 AM

um... am I understanding this wrong?
if not then I choose
196*42=8232
what happens now?
  • 0

#3 PDR

PDR

    Junior Member

  • Members
  • PipPip
  • 50 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 01:01 AM

am i missing something?
45 X 123 = 5535
46 X 123 = 5658
47 X 123 = 5781
48 X 123 = 5904
49 X 123 = 6027
54 X 123 = 6642
56 X 123 = 6888
57 X 123 = 7011
58 X 123 = 7134
59 X 123 = 7257
64 X 123 = 7872
65 X 123 = 7995
67 X 123 = 8241
68 X 123 = 8364
69 X 123 = 8487
74 X 124 = 9176
75 X 125 = 9375
76 X 126 = 9576
78 X 127 = 9906
45 X 132 = 5940
46 X 132 = 6072
47 X 132 = 6204
48 X 132 = 6336
49 X 132 = 6468
54 X 132 = 7128
56 X 132 = 7392
57 X 132 = 7524
58 X 132 = 7656
59 X 132 = 7788
64 X 132 = 8448
65 X 132 = 8580
67 X 132 = 8844
68 X 132 = 8976
69 X 132 = 9108
74 X 132 = 9768
75 X 132 = 9900
there may be more - but I got tired of looking...
  • 0

#4 spoxjox

spoxjox

    Junior Member

  • Members
  • PipPip
  • 97 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 01:04 AM

I'm pretty sure mini me means for you to use each digit from 1 to 9 exactly once in the equation.
  • 0

#5 mini me

mini me

    Newbie

  • Members
  • Pip
  • 2 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 01:20 AM

You can only use each number once. but nice try
  • 0

#6 PDR

PDR

    Junior Member

  • Members
  • PipPip
  • 50 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 01:48 AM

ahhh - suddenly it gets a bit trickier...
138 x 42 = 5796
157 x 28 = 4396
159 x 48 = 7632
186 x 39 = 7254
198 x 27 = 5346
297 x 18 = 5346
483 x 12 = 5796
  • 0

#7 Ploper

Ploper

    Senior Member

  • Members
  • PipPipPipPip
  • 579 posts

Posted 04 January 2008 - 03:27 AM

oooh!
now I understand it
nice puzzle
  • 0




0 user(s) are reading this topic

0 members, 0 guests, 0 anonymous users